THE SOCIETY OF ST PIUS X

Charity number: 274695
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.43m £1.17m £1.34m £1.39m £4.05m
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.19m £1.69m £1.55m £1.65m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.11m £721.75k £881.53k £793.11k £3.60m
Income - Other trading activities £260.32k £357.34k £378.75k £555.62k £394.56k
Income - Charitable activities £49.77k £57.81k £44.39k £18.76k £22.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £32.48k £36.49k £39.52k £24.38k £35.72k
Income - Other £969.04k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £679.76k £679.76k £32.32k £16.34k £2.99m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.07m £1.25m £1.69m £1.55m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £63.54k £50.72k £106.62k £91.83k £24.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £49.91k £51.50k £2.87k £2.63k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 -£54.66k £1.29k £1.14k £0