2ND UXBRIDGE (ST MARGARETS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Redgrave Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
STEPHEN LEIGHS Trustee 03 January 2013 None on record
Natalie Delaney Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Anthony George Harrison Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
MR MIKE PAYEN Trustee None on record
IAN MCKAY Trustee 02 January 2012 None on record
Christopher Troughton Trustee 12 May 2017 None on record
Neal Ashwood Trustee 12 May 2017 None on record
Joyce White Trustee 12 May 2017 None on record
Clare Green Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
David Redgrave Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Mark Loring Trustee 12 May 2017 None on record
MR TONY WOLFF Trustee None on record
SUSAN LEIGHS Chair None on record