Accounts and annual returns LAMBETH ORCHESTRA FUND

Charity number: 274831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window