Financial history BISHOP OF WINCHESTER'S UGANDA CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 274907
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.80k £15.26k £15.57k £16.03k £16.52k
Total expenditure £13.30k £7.74k £5.29k £0 £2.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A