Trustees THE SOUTHERN COUNTIES HISTORIC VEHICLES PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 274950
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Christopher Paul Writer | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Fowler | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Down | Trustee | 09 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Margaret Brown | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Ronald Tullett | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Tullett | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Jean Durrant | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANNE HAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET LEEVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WILLIAM LEEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.