Financial history BODICOTE CHURCH BOUNTY FUND

Charity number: 275043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.28k £1.79k £1.83k £1.94k £2.09k
Total expenditure £5.28k £2.64k £1.98k £1.73k £1.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A