Accounts and annual returns ANGLO CENTRAL AMERICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 275099
Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 574 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 574 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 February 2020 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 March 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required