Financial history ANGLO CENTRAL AMERICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 275099
Charity reporting is overdue by 583 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.22k £3.84k £1.95k £1.28k £313
Total expenditure £8.61k £5.52k £2.06k £3.60k £117
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A