Trustees THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE HISTORY OF GLASS, LIMITED
Charity number: 275236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Michael PENN | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian Charles FREESTONE | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caroline Mary JACKSON | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thomas James DERRICK | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Lindsay Marsh | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Spier | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Alice Sainsbury | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ana Franjic | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Alice Louise Lucas | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleonora Montanari | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Nicholas Peake | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniela Rosenow | Trustee | 28 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH COTTAM | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HIGGOTT | Trustee | 02 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN JOHN BRAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.