Financial history LAUDERDALE HOUSE SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 275502
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £460.63k £474.96k £523.38k £303.51k £551.62k
Total expenditure £366.41k £444.16k £492.44k £297.74k £351.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £300 £133.67k £87.88k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £123.57k N/A £102.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £399.20k N/A £448.63k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £615 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £477.21k N/A £342.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £15.23k N/A £9.53k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £8.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0