Financial history THE BRITISH SUB AQUA JUBILEE TRUST

Charity number: 275835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.58k £3.14k £4.50k £3.65k £4.07k
Total expenditure £8.46k £4.50k £3.79k £3.79k £3.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A