Financial history PLAN INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 276035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £64.26m £66.71m £60.96m £62.61m £69.77m
Total expenditure £63.46m £62.16m £58.94m £59.19m £74.86m
Income from government contracts £3.18m £7.43m £7.60m £1.72m £2.38m
Income from government grants £12.55m £8.34m £14.56m £12.07m £16.48m
Income - Donations and legacies £30.28m £28.51m £28.07m £25.39m £24.75m
Income - Other trading activities £637.00k £4.66m £1.38m £5.28m £7.59m
Income - Charitable activities £33.21m £32.95m £30.87m £31.15m £36.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.00k £36.00k £99.00k £115.00k £5.00k
Income - Other £118.00k £561.00k £542.00k £674.00k £676.00k
Income - Legacies £580.00k £666.00k £479.00k £995.00k £564.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £52.65m £51.30m £48.65m £49.05m £64.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.37m £10.45m £9.85m £9.72m £9.72m
Expenditure - Governance £556.00k £262.00k £235.00k £268.00k £253.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £50.20m £43.55m £39.57m £36.79m £48.96m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £440.00k £409.00k £443.00k £417.00k £342.00k