Financial history ASPECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £32.16k £108.78k £117.34k £32.45k £24.01k
Total expenditure £21.59k £2.68k £2.10k £2.39k £2.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A