Financial history HIGHBURY AREA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276283
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.08k £28.05k £31.20k £39.37k £34.94k
Total expenditure £14.38k £17.87k £21.37k £20.06k £31.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k £6.50k £6.50k £6.50k £6.50k