WEST INDIAN WELFARE (UK ) TRUST

Charity number: 276316
Charity reporting is overdue by 1691 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 230 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 230 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 596 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 596 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 961 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 961 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1326 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1326 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1691 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1691 days