Dogfen lywodraethu SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 OCTOBER 1962 AND RE-REGISTERED ON 30TH MAY 1997 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 FEBRUARY 1973, 14 AUGUST 1978 AND CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26TH JUNE 1997
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BAHA'I RELIGION AND SHARING THE IDEALS AND ASSISTING THE EFFORTS OF OUR FELLOW BAHA'IS TO ESTABLISH, UPHOLD AND PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL EDUCATION AND HUMANITARIAN TEACHINGS OF HUMAN BROTHERHOOD, RADIANT FAITH, EXALTED CHARACTER AND SELFLESS LOVE REVEALED IN THE LIVES AND UTTERANCES OF ALL THE PROPHETS AND MESSENGERS OF GOD, FOUNDERS OF THE WORLD'S REVERED RELIGIONS, AND GIVEN RENEWED CREATIVE ENERGY AND UNIVERSAL APPLICATION TO THE CONDITIONS OF THIS AGE IN THE LIFE AND UTTERANCES OF THE BAHA'U'LLAH, TO ADMINISTER THE AFFAIRS OF THE FAITH OF BAHA'U'LLAH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BAHA'IS OF BRIGHTON ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF BAHA'I AFFILIATION AND ADMINISTRATION CREATED AND ESTABLISHED BY BAHA'U'LLAH, DEFINED AND EXPLAINED BY "ABDU-L-BAHA" INTERPRETED AND AMPLIFIED BY SHOGHI EFFENDI AND SUPPLEMENTED AND APPLIED BY THE UNIVERSAL HOUSE OF JUSND APPLIED BY THE UNIVERSAL HOUSE OF JUSTICE, ORDAINED BY BAHA'U'LLAH IN HIS SACRED WRITINGS AS THE SUPREME BODY OF THE BAHA'I RELIGION.
Maes buddion
BRIGHTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.