RACHEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £8.49m £15.35m £6.09m £4.32m £5.86m
Total expenditure £7.41m £4.69m £6.12m £4.99m £7.63m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.46m £7.08m £3.84m £2.22m £4.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.03m £2.44m £2.25m £2.09m £1.79m
Income - Other £0 £5.83m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.46m £3.16m £4.96m £3.70m £5.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.94m £1.53m £1.15m £1.29m £1.93m
Expenditure - Governance £9.90k £16.30k £2.75k £9.40k £43.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.45m £3.14m £4.96m £3.69m £5.66m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.94m £1.53m £1.15m £1.29m £1.93m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0