Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S CHURCH (HITCHIN) PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 276501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 July 2022 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required