Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL
Charity number: 277047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Daniel Pennington | Chair | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annike Spiller | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Damien Cahill | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maia Swift | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Rush | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Haughton Willis | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henna Bakshi | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Slipper | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Providence-Jackson | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Doughty | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Miles | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aislinn McDermott | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Katzka | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Joaquim | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Radford | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abby Marshall | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Manning | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Patten | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Terri Pomeroy | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BETTINA CARLYON | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Meyer | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.