Accounts and annual returns SOUTH ASIA ARCHIVE AND LIBRARY GROUP

Charity number: 277132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 October 2020 24 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2019 24 August 2021 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2018 31 January 2020 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2017 02 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2016 17 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2016 Not Required