COMMUNITY ARTS NORTHWEST

Charity number: 277135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2017 On time Download