COMMUNITY ARTS NORTHWEST

Charity number: 277135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £295.90k £284.25k £303.88k £280.09k £294.21k
Total expenditure £289.82k £289.19k £264.80k £266.79k £258.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £191.10k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k