COMMUNITY ARTS NORTHWEST

Charity number: 277135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PEGGY MULONGO Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record
Maya Alexandra Sharma Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Dr Rajesh Ramanbhai Patel Trustee 21 June 2016 None on record
Tim Whiston Trustee 02 March 2020 None on record
Gurdeep Kaur Thiara Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Lesa Dryburgh Trustee 22 July 2019 None on record
MARTIN HAZLEHURST Chair None on record
CATHERINE HALL Trustee 12 December 2012 None on record