Financial history NORTH LONDON CHORUS

Charity number: 277544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £45.09k £47.30k £43.69k £35.19k £23.33k
Total expenditure £46.45k £58.92k £46.17k £29.33k £17.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A