Dogfen lywodraethu SE FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/12/1978 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/03/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/10/2015 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 SEP 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE, AMONGST EMPLOYEES OR RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF BARCLAYS BANK LIMITED, BARCLAYS BANK INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, AND SUCH OTHER COMPANIES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE STATED TO BE SUPPLEMENTAL AND THEIR SPOUSES, WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND CHILDREN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.