RADIO FOREST HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity number: 277847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 07 January 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 06 January 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 13 January 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2016 06 February 2017 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2016 Not Required