Financial history AGE CONCERN PERRANPORTH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 278049
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £31.35k £24.33k £17.59k £22.60k £32.37k
Total expenditure £20.57k £11.83k £16.08k £7.89k £13.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.43k £2.67k