THE LEATHERSELLERS' COMPANY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 278072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £1.71m £1.87m £1.94m £2.09m £2.03m
Total expenditure £2.30m £2.82m £3.25m £3.63m £3.87m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £42.00k £42.00k £46.00k £114.00k £263.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.67m £1.83m £1.89m £1.98m £1.77m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.15m £2.65m £3.06m £3.44m £3.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £152.00k £176.00k £187.00k £193.00k £403.00k
Expenditure - Governance £12.00k £12.00k £13.00k £16.00k £11.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.78m £2.28m £2.62m £3.02m £3.23m
Expenditure - Investment management £152.00k £176.00k £187.00k £193.00k £165.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0