OUTREACH 3 WAY

Charity number: 278140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Noah Felix Kalman Franklin Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Angela McNab Trustee 01 August 2020
DIMENSIONS SOMERSET SEV LIMITED Received: On time
Huw John Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Shahana OBE Trustee 29 September 2021 None on record
Supriya Suri Malik Trustee 16 November 2016
INTERNET WATCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
Stephen Scown Trustee 05 August 2019 None on record
Gordon Lyle Trustee 22 October 2014 None on record
Delyth Lloyd-Evans Trustee 13 April 2017
VOLUNTARY ACTION NORTH SOMERSET Received: On time
Nicholas Baldwin Chair 19 September 2018
DIMENSIONS CYMRU LIMITED Recently registered
THE EXTRACARE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
David Isenegger Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record