MICHAEL B HACKER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 278182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 September 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 01 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required