Financial history ST EDMUND'S SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 278301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.85m £5.09m £5.78m £6.16m £6.89m
Total expenditure £4.40m £4.68m £5.34m £5.90m £6.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £63.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.02k £1.25k £119 £500 £4.92k
Income - Other trading activities £1.39k £18.98k £22.44k £10.78k £11.31k
Income - Charitable activities £4.84m £5.07m £5.76m £5.93m £6.81m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.66k £6 £8 £19 £4
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £216.14k £63.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.28m £4.57m £5.21m £5.78m £6.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £121.05k £109.73k £131.76k £120.09k £135.25k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0