Financial history STACEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £57.00k £58.92k £59.12k £60.58k £93.57k
Total expenditure £55.54k £57.00k £53.12k £41.11k £66.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £2.50k £2.25k £29.15k £39.91k