Financial history THE KISHARON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278369
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £920.73k £225.92k £442.13k £1.29m £386.33k
Total expenditure £223.62k £208.89k £198.53k £197.84k £290.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £549.39k N/A N/A £1.01m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £371.34k N/A N/A £171.00k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £110.27k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £173.33k N/A N/A £154.07k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £50.29k N/A N/A £43.78k N/A