18TH IPSWICH (HOLYWELLS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 278515
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)