ST BEDE'S SCHOOL TRUST SUSSEX

Charity number: 278950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £24.43m £26.74m £28.32m £29.43m £23.74m
Total expenditure £24.34m £25.46m £26.70m £27.17m £23.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.00k £3.00k £6.00k £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £343.00k £281.00k £241.00k
Income - Charitable activities £24.29m £26.61m £27.94m £29.08m £22.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £1.00k £23.00k £55.00k £38.00k
Income - Other £134.00k £133.00k £13.00k £9.00k £13.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.44m £24.61m £26.70m £26.27m £22.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £901.00k £848.00k £0 £897.00k £1.01m
Expenditure - Governance £32.00k £26.00k £27.00k £0 £24.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0