FRIENDS OF HOUGHTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 279312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £7.40k £15.64k £10.10k £9.80k £4.64k
Total expenditure £9.73k £16.85k £10.87k £7.77k £5.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A