RIGPA FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 279315
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £271.04k £383.09k £324.80k £230.10k £152.02k
Total expenditure £266.88k £398.27k £370.41k £310.58k £155.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A