DOMINICA OVERSEA NATIONALS ASSOCIATION AID - DOMINICA DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 279643
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £13.75k £9.26k £25.92k £15.97k £13.49k
Total expenditure £11.66k £7.12k £25.91k £19.53k £14.82k