CENTRE STAGE LONDON

Charity number: 279647
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James-Lee Campbell Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
Grace Jenkins Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
James Newall Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
ALEXIS ROSE Chair 08 August 2014 None on record
Zsolt Szabo Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
Samantha Miller Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Charlie Smith Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
Lauren Clarke Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
Darren Martin Trustee 02 August 2018 None on record
Ashlie Kenyon Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
CORTINA HENDERSON Trustee None on record
Nicholas James Henry Dore Trustee 07 August 2015 None on record
Stuart James Wimsett Trustee 12 August 2016 None on record