CENTRE LINKS TRUST

Charity number: 279674
Charity reporting is overdue by 1696 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £419 £456 £158 £164 £6
Total expenditure £552 £662 £257 £320 £77
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A