Financial history NORTH KENSINGTON LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 279699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £374.07k £441.25k £385.92k £416.36k £616.53k
Total expenditure £378.04k £418.98k £374.99k £384.28k £447.64k
Income from government contracts £61.91k N/A £106.88k N/A £31.40k
Income from government grants £82.35k £61.91k £63.60k £67.60k £64.87k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.27k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.05k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £591.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £20
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £430.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.22k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0