FRIENDS OF BOYTON CHURCH

Charity number: 279734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £8.26k £8.78k £8.36k £8.21k £9.49k
Total expenditure £686 £12.72k £8.08k £6.49k £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A