THE ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM AND SERAPHIM THURSDAY PRAYERISTS CHURCH

Charity number: 279871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £0 £8.74k £7.87k £8.65k £5.56k
Total expenditure £5.56k £4.22k £7.11k £7.75k £5.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A