Accounts and annual returns THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279882
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 116 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 February 2024 473 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 February 2024 473 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window