THE MAYOR OF SOUTHWARK'S COMMON GOOD TRUST

Charity number: 280011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.50k £12.52k £4.64k £8.11k £2.61k
Total expenditure £11.40k £10.21k £9.20k £18.81k £11.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A