ST STEPHENS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 February 2020 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 October 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required