Financial history LANGLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.22k £3.91k £6.60k £5.43k £3.16k
Total expenditure £5.72k £3.47k £6.12k £6.31k £3.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A