WROXHAM AND HOVETON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 280331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £97.50k £75.66k £88.59k £83.48k £107.26k
Total expenditure £99.07k £84.65k £79.94k £94.14k £88.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £30.00k