ST GEORGE'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.92k £4.84k £4.01k £3.71k £2.24k
Total expenditure £3.32k £4.50k £4.25k £3.74k £3.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A