Financial history THE GARDEN ESTATES ASSOCIATION OF PETTS WOOD

Charity number: 280397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.16k £30.20k £30.40k £32.46k £16.39k
Total expenditure £21.83k £19.64k £19.95k £23.59k £10.30k
Income from government contracts £700 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A